+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 03-11-20 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
- Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 285) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3261) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:15PM in conference room 016.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HRE/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2715) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/TEC will hold a public decision making on 02-04-20 3:06PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
- The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 2:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE/TEC, JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor