+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Nishihara.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-05-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-03-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-14 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, CPN.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.