+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Nishihara.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.