+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Riviere.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-06-18 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 1:35PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, JDC.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor