+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 85-16) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 85-16).
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Nishimoto, Johanson, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Baker, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Johanson, Fukumoto Chang.
- Re-referred to HLT/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Baker, Tokuda Co-Chairs.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-14-16.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 485).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-23-16 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 31
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:40AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2445) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 12:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.