+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2288) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kidani; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda, Slom.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor