+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2505) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBR, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.