+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-18-14 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 232) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2285) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda, Slom.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:00PM in conference room 414.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor