+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
- The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH/JDC.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.