+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715).
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, Souki excused (2).
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 121-16).
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, DeCoite, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 121-16) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 11:00AM in conference room 309.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 3:30PM in conference room 309.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-16 3:35PM in conference room 309.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689).
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Galuteria.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cachola, DeCoite, Pouha.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 543).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting no (2) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1618-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Pouha.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2733) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 9:20AM in conference room 211.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor