+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:35AM in conference room 309.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:35AM in House conference room 309. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 282) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3094) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-26-20 1:45PM in conference room 211.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 12:25PM in conference room 211.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor