+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 011, 04/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Act 011, on 04/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1111).
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 471).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Woodson.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-11-16 11:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 25
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 54).
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from EET/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2570) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to EET/WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.