+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-05-14 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-27-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.