+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2749) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:25AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.