+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-19-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor