+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 689).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Evans, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ward.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Nishihara.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786).
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555).
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 410).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 207) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kim . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere, Ruderman, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2873) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, K. Kahele.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 10:45AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/ETT, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor