+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3254) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:15AM in conference room 016.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2569) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.