+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-17-16 3:00PM in conference room 225.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 2:55PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.