+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (54)
On July 12, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1398).
On July 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07/12/2022 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1398).
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
On June 27, 2022 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none).
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and none excused (0).
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 198-22) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 198-22).
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Johanson, Marten, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kidani, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-22 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 325.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-22 at 7:15PM in Conference Room 325.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-22 10:20AM in conference room 325.
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-28-22 10:15AM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Johanson, Marten Co-Chairs; Perruso, Matsumoto.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Misalucha, Fevella.
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873).
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 630).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871).
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti, McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1958-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Perruso, Tam; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1417-22), recommending referral to FIN.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 248) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3061) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2097) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor