+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 1:30PM in conference room 016.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/ENE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor