+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:10PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.