+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from EEP/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, McDermott.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP/HHS on Friday, 03-16-18 9:00AM in conference room 329.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HHS on Friday, 03-16-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 197) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2597) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
- Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Nishihara.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:30PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN, CPH.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor