+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 at 5:35PM in conference room 309.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 414.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting rescheduled for 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 414.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-16 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
- House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Johanson Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; English Co-Chair; Ihara, Slom.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-14-16.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 481).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 178) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2609) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:45AM in conference room 211.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ihara, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor