+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2132) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor