+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from PSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 595) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor