+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-16 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2385) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere, Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-16-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.