+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 217, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 217, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77-18).
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77-18) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Gabbard, K. Rhoads.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, Thielen.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1883-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 184) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.