+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
- The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 3:00PM in conference room 016.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to WTL/EGH, WAM.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.