+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 199) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Shimabukuro . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2820) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ruderman; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from AGL/HRE/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2204) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-06-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda.
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai, Slom.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/HRE/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 3:20PM in conference room 229.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/HRE/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.