+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:45pm in Conference Room 016.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:45 PM in Conference Room 229.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:45PM in Conference Room 229.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 9:15AM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-17-14 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Green, Taniguchi, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto Members.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 572).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1636-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-03-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 945-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan, Oshiro.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 03-10-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2752) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-14 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.