+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1487) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
- Pass First Reading
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor