+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/EGH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 120) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, English.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/EGH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/EGH/TEC, WAM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.