+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, CPH.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/ETT, CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor