+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor