+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1027-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-01-16 at 10:00AM in room 329.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-25-16 11:00AM in House conference room 329.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 17
- Pass First Reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 15) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-16-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor