+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07-10-18 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1155)
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-25-18 (Gov. Msg. No. 1155)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Matsumoto, Tokioka, Tupola voting no (4) and none excused (0).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12-18).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12-18) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786).
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Nishihara.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, San Buenaventura, Takumi Co-Chairs; Tupola.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 486).
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 402).
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1752-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364-18), recommending referral to CPC.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 325.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, JUD, CPC, referral sheet 39
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:40AM in House conference room 329.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2541) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.