+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/JDC, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.