+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.