+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-12-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPN, JDL.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor