+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 11:00AM in conference room 225.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:40PM in conference room 225.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 2:40PM in conference room 225.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Nishihara, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola.
- Re-referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-14-16.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-12-16.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 398).
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Yamashita.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 10:15AM in conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-21-16 10:15AM in House conference room 309.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 31
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 353) in amended form (SD 3).
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Riviere, L. Thielen). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-16.
- Report filed.
- Separated Committee Report.
- Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
- Floor Amendment No. 1 offered.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2598) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Slom.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 3:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/PSM, JDL/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.