+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2344) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Inouye.
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA/PSM, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor