+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Fale, Ing, C. Lee, Saiki, Takai excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 983-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 167) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:15AM in conference room 211.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2019) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-14 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH, WAM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.