+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-24-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/EET.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor