+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRS, JDC.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.