+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH/TRE, WAM.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.