+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 184, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Act 184, on 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 703).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-21-14.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-21-14.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 557).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Evans, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan, Oshiro voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Woodson excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1507-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Woodson.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2538) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-05-14 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor