+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 148, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act 148, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 84-14).
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom.
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 84-14) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:45AM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 10:30AM in conference room 229.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674).
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Ing Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Espero, Kidani Co-Chairs; L. Thielen, Slom Members.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 555).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1567-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, McDermott.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 27
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2482) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-14 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2094) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-14 2:45PM in conference room CR 224.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.