+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 312.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 2:45PM in conference room 312.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 2:45PM in conference room 312.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, McDermott Members.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, McDermott.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 153) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2565) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 3:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, WAM.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.