+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 28
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 63).
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 02-28-14.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2501) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 3:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, CPN.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.