+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
- Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
- Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3210) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2661) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, WAM.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor